Zoning and Planning

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0033Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose ProjectsDelegate VitaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0346 / CH0414Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to MagistrateDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 414Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0539State Highway Administration - Evaluation of Urban Highways - Classifications and Speed LimitsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0599 / CH0439
    (SB0839)
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - PenaltiesSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0621
    (SB0656)
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit ProcessDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0628Prince George's County - Municipal Zoning Authority MC/PG 111-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0881
    (SB0256)
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation ActDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0916Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0919 / CH0288
    (SB0551)
Land Use - Plans - Development and AdoptionDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0938
    (SB0564 / CH0365)
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in Zoning MC/PG 112-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0976Task Force to Study the Impact of Methadone Clinics on Surrounding Communities and BusinessesDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0989
    (SB0713)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1034Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Governing Bodies of Municipal Corporations Exercising Zoning Authority PG 420-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationEthics (G2)
HB1109 / CH0469Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties, and ResponsibilitiesChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 469Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0256
    (HB0881)
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation ActSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0551
    (HB0919 / CH0288)
Land Use - Plans - Development and AdoptionSenator RosapepeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0564 / CH0365
    (HB0938)
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in ZoningSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0656
    (HB0621)
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit ProcessSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0713
    (HB0989)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0839
    (HB0599 / CH0439)
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - PenaltiesSenator WaughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:43 P.M.