Anne Arundel County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0018 / CH0604
    (SB0016)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 604Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0145 / CH0215
    (SB0244 / CH0214)
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0370 / CH0226
    (SB0313 / CH0225)
Workers' Compensation - Anne Arundel County Deputy SheriffApproved by the Governor - Chapter 226Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB1305 / CH0675City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency RequirementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 675Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0163
    (SB0172)
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' CourtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:45 A.M.