Anne Arundel County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 7)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0087 / CH0336
    (SB0747 / CH0335)
Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - CompensationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Ways and Means
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0591
    (SB1015 / CH0367)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting LicensesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0825
    (SB0639)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney and Deputy, Assistant, and Temporary Assistant State's Attorneys - Annual Salary and CompensationIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1381 / CH0108Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary IncreasesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1409 / CH0456Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of AnnapolisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0552
    (SB0246 / CH0148)
Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police ForceVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - OtherCommunity Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
HB1089
    (SB0946)
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 10, 2014 7:22 P.M.