Anne Arundel County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0158 / CH0804
    (SB0049 / CH0805)
Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - SalaryEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB0309 / CH0070Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - RegulationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1076Maryland Transit Administration - Station Safety Pilot ProgramIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1247 / CH0838Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – CompensationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0429
    (SB0265)
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and ReleaseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.