Anne Arundel County Senators

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0172
    (HB0163)
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' CourtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0173
    (HB0113)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - OtherEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0174
    (HB0146)
Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement RequestsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0450Education Trust Fund - Security Personnel and Equipment and Mental Health ServicesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

October 30, 2013 7:45 A.M.