Anne Arundel County Senators

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 7)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0048
    (HB0366 / CH0102)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind IndividualsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0141 / CH0353
    (HB0602 / CH0354)
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater ServicesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeSpecial Taxing Districts (L4)
SB0142
    (HB0566)
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale AdvertisingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0143
    (HB0428)
Property Tax - Interest on RefundsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0144
    (HB0172 / CH0035)
Anne Arundel County - School Board Nominating Commission - MembershipIn the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0188
    (HB0427)
Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit AmountIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0521
    (HB0764)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.