Administration

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 30)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0100 / CH0423
    (SB0125)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014)Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 423AppropriationsBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0101 / CH0424
    (SB0126)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424AppropriationsBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0115 / CH0426
    (SB0141)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0224 / CH0158
    (SB0279 / CH0157)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - AdministrationElections (G1)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0227 / CH0002
    (SB0278 / CH0001)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - AdministrationInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0229 / CH0004
    (SB0277)
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable IncomeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0294
    (SB0281 / CH0427)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPublic Safety (E4)
HB0295
    (SB0276 / CH0156)
Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide VictimsIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0863
    (SB0841 / CH0428)
Higher Education Fair Share ActVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0125
    (HB0100 / CH0423)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014)In the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0126
    (HB0101 / CH0424)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012In the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0141
    (HB0115 / CH0426)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
By Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsBy Request - AdministrationInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0275
    (HB0226 / CH0003)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
SB0276 / CH0156
    (HB0295)
Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of ParoleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 12:30 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0277
    (HB0229 / CH0004)
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable IncomeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0278 / CH0001
    (HB0227 / CH0002)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 1Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0279 / CH0157
    (HB0224 / CH0158)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationElections (G1)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
By Request - AdministrationPublic Safety (E4)
SB0538
    (HB0560 / CH0005)
Public-Private PartnershipsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0841 / CH0428
    (HB0863)
Higher Education Fair Share ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesBy Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:45 A.M.