Administration

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 25)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0070 / CH0310
    (SB0055)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 310AppropriationsBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0071 / CH0495
    (SB0056)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495 (Line Item Veto)AppropriationsBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0110 / CH0401
    (SB0079)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0480
    (SB0590)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0481
    (SB0588)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0482
    (SB0592 / CH0125)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0483
    (SB0589)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0484
    (SB0591)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0485 / CH0312
    (SB0593)
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax CheckoffApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - AdministrationElections (G1)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0488
    (SB0594)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0055
    (HB0070 / CH0310)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)In the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0056
    (HB0071 / CH0495)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014In the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0079
    (HB0110 / CH0401)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0588
    (HB0481)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
SB0589
    (HB0483)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0590
    (HB0480)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0591
    (HB0484)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0592 / CH0125
    (HB0482)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals at Least 65 Years OldApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0593
    (HB0485 / CH0312)
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax CheckoffIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - AdministrationElections (G1)
SB0594
    (HB0488)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0595 / CH0311
    (HB0486)
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.