Allegany County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0254 / CH0092Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before ReleaseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0255 / CH0093Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB0449
    (SB0393)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0463
    (SB0440)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware FacilityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0467 / CH0118Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit DurationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0584
    (SB0204)
Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for ProtectionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryBy Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0593
    (SB0298)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0738Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - False Statements About Destructive Devices or Toxic MaterialsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0816 / CH0070
    (SB0629 / CH0069)
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and ConsumptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1362
    (SB0927)
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:26 P.M.