Allegany County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 7)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0343
    (SB0383 / CH0295)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio MemberVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0516
    (SB0531)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware FacilityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0689
    (SB0599)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0691
    (SB0605 / CH0538)
Property Tax Credit - Upper Stories of Commercial Structures - RehabilitationIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1444
    (SB1037)
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery OrganizationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations By Request - CommitteeFamily Law (D4)
HB1445
    (SB1023)
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional OfficersIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations By Request - CommitteeWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB1493 / CH0253
    (SB1074)
Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on DutyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.