Allegany County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 11)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0543
    (SB0483 / CH0069)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age to Serve LiquorVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0560
    (SB0349)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany and Garrett Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0577
    (SB0431 / CH0206)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing DateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Generally (L1)
HB0755
    (SB0524)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Black Bears - BaitingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0987
    (SB0900)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Lefty Grove StatueIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0994 / CH0286
    (SB0736)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Class A LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 286Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0995 / CH0589
    (SB0878 / CH0588)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1538
    (SB1044)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1539
    (SB1045)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware FacilityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1540
    (SB1025)
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Ownership CostsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB1541Higher Education - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel - Partial Tuition WaiverIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeHigher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.