Appropriations Committee, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0268 / CH0095University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science - Joint Graduate Degree Granting AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 95Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
HB0553Higher Education - Program Proposals - Review and ObjectionsIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
HB0616 / CH0123Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 123Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCapital Budget (B5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:26 P.M.