Appropriations Committee, Chair

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0103 / CH0205Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - RenamingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0104Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - LiensIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0105Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAppropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0134 / CH0105Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community DevelopmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - DepartmentalSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB0199 / CH0116Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities CentersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElderly (O2)
HB0717 / CH0143Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCapital Budget (B5)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:43 P.M.