Attorney General, Office of the

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1439
    (SB0870)
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Subpoena PowerIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1480 / CH0592
    (SB0982 / CH0593)
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious OrdersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 592Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1544 / CH0847
    (SB0891 / CH0848)
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil PenaltyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0870
    (HB1439)
Criminal Procedure – Office of the Attorney General – Subpoena PowerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0891 / CH0848
    (HB1544 / CH0847)
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil PenaltyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - OtherCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0982 / CH0593
    (HB1480 / CH0592)
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious OrdersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 593Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.