Budget and Taxation Committee, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0088 / CH0274Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0095 / CH0128Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training, Quality Assurance, and Employee SafetyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 128Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0106 / CH0129Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - ExemptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 129Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0123 / CH0137Major Information Technology Development Project Fund - Revenue Sources and Authorized ExpendituresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0128Education - Compensatory Education Grants - Federal Community Eligibility ProvisionIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0998 / CH0575
    (HB0821)
Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 575Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations By Request - DepartmentalCapital Budget (B5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.