Budget and Taxation Committee, Chair

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 2 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0076 / CH0156Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - ScheduleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0280 / CH0061Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCapital Budget (B5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.