Baltimore City Senators

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0263
    (HB0354 / CH0396)
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange ProgramIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
SB0264
    (HB0312)
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - ProhibitionIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0266
    (HB0313 / CH0594)
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - WarrantsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0267 / CH0478
    (HB0314 / CH0479)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed DwellingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0390 / CH0493
    (HB0386)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.