Baltimore City Administration

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 16)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0149Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsBy Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
HB0194
    (SB0270)
Baltimore City - School Facilities - FundingIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0197
    (SB0271)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0521
    (SB0366 / CH0462)
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground RentsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeReal Property (N1)
HB0525
    (SB0516 / CH0283)
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating DeficitsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesBy Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0588
    (SB0473 / CH0474)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0770
    (SB0742 / CH0312)
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore CityIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0966
    (SB0788)
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion PracticesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1053 / CH0041
    (SB0282 / CH0040)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
SB0270
    (HB0194)
Baltimore City - School Facilities - FundingIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and TaxationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0271
    (HB0197)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - PenaltiesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0282 / CH0040
    (HB1053 / CH0041)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
SB0366 / CH0462
    (HB0521)
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground RentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 462Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeReal Property (N1)
SB0473 / CH0474
    (HB0588)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0516 / CH0283
    (HB0525)
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating DeficitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0742 / CH0312
    (HB0770)
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore CityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:26 P.M.