Baltimore City Administration

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 19)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0123 / CH0068
    (SB0186)
Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - ModificationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0133
    (SB0169)
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement OfficerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0228
    (SB0337)
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy Program - Repeal of Termination DateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
HB0363Crimes - Law Enforcement Officer - Misconduct In OfficeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0384Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Conviction - Not Entitled to a HearingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB0497 / CH0253
    (SB0356)
Property Tax - Exemption - Low Income Housing - Ownership by Limited Liability CompanyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0506
    (SB0410 / CH0168)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0507
    (SB0541 / CH0038)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - SupermarketsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0543 / CH0258
    (SB0355)
Baltimore City - Housing Authority of Baltimore City - Subsidiary EntitiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0631
    (SB0357)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1035 / CH0114
    (SB0439)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0169
    (HB0133)
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement OfficerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0186
    (HB0123 / CH0068)
Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - ModificationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0337
    (HB0228)
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy Program - Repeal of Termination DateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
SB0355
    (HB0543 / CH0258)
Baltimore City - Housing Authority of Baltimore City - Subsidiary EntitiesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0356
    (HB0497 / CH0253)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Exemption - Low Income HousingIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0357
    (HB0631)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - CommitteeNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0439
    (HB1035 / CH0114)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0541 / CH0038
    (HB0507)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - SupermarketsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.