Baltimore City Administration

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 11)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0146 / CH0559
    (SB0552 / CH0558)
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers and Public Safety OfficersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0374
    (SB0603 / CH0567)
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior CrimesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0376Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - IncreaseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0385 / CH0484Baltimore City - Abandoned Property - Tax Sales - Ground RentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0619Law Enforcement Officer - Misdemeanor - Hearing and Emergency SuspensionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB0649Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Extension of Time for Review and Final Order by ChiefIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB0784Sales and Use Tax - Baby Diapers - ExemptionIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1107Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless ArrestsIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1262
    (SB0829)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1579Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing BoardIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
SB0829
    (HB1262)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.