Baltimore County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0155Baltimore County Revenue Authority - Purchases - Competitive BiddingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0320 / CH0033
    (SB0217 / CH0032)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore CountyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1475
    (SB1070)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB1524 / CH0691Election Law - Baltimore County Democratic Party Central Committee - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 691Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB0321
    (SB0218)
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2013 Edition - LegalizationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBy Request - OtherCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1400Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:26 P.M.