Calvert County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0802
    (SB0458 / CH0056)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0822
    (SB0656 / CH0516)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilityIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1273Education - Calvert County Board of Education - Annual AuditIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1448 / CH0338Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.