Calvert County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0759Calvert County - Deer Hunting - SundaysIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1054Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed LegislationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1056Calvert County - Length of Service Award - Fire Fighters, Rescue Squad Members, and Rescue Dive Team Members - Increase AuthorizedIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1079 / CH0487Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1106Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Volunteer Fire Companies and Fraternal OrganizationsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1107Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle Clubs - ProhibitionsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1184
    (SB0168 / CH0043)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1436Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan ParticipationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.