Calvert County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1155Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1156 / CH0416Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1157 / CH0302Calvert County - Assistant Sheriff - Salary and StatusApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1268 / CH0506Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent FelonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 506Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB1353 / CH0650Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival PermitApproved by the Governor - Chapter 650Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1445 / CH0138Calvert County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce ZonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1483Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident BiddersIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1493 / CH0140Calvert County - Economic Development Incentive Fund - Eligibility CriteriaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.