Calvert County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 16)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0446 / CH0111Calvert County - Fire and Rescue Commission - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0498 / CH0112Calvert County - Salary of Assistant SheriffApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0627 / CH0113Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death BenefitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0725Calvert County - Budget Changes - Publication and Hearing ThresholdIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0727 / CH0743State Designations - State Paleontology Collection and Research Center - Calvert Marine MuseumApproved by the Governor - Chapter 743Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0729 / CH0114Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted BudgetApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0815 / CH0744Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and BiddingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 744Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1084Calvert County - County Superintendent of Schools - Postemployment Compensation and BenefitsIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1102 / CH0115Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1105Job-Related Alcohol and Controlled Dangerous Substances Testing - Medical Review Officers and Preliminary Breath TestsIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
HB1114 / CH0116Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident BiddersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Health and Government Operations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1354 / CH0117Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1357 / CH0841Calvert County - County Officials - SalariesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1458District Court – County Zoning Violation – AppealsIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1459 / CH0118Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Generally (L1)
HB1484Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo LicenseIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.