Calvert County Senators

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0168 / CH0043
    (HB1184)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0339Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - License ApplicationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0340 / CH0292Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unlicensed Establishments - ProhibitionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0341 / CH0486Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0495 / CH0512Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Premises Inspections and PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0496 / CH0513Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Organizational LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 513Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0548 / CH0521Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Festival) Beer, Wine and Liquor PermitApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0611Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Charity) Beer, Wine and Liquor LicenseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0612 / CH0310Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan ParticipationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0673Calvert County - Discharge of a Firearm Near BuildingsIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledJudicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.