Caroline County Senators

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0436 / CH0821
    (HB0554 / CH0820)
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ SalariesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB1072 / CH0243
    (HB1422 / CH0242)
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 243Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1251 / CH0069Property Tax - Municipal Corporations - Electricity Generation Facilities - Negotiated Payments in Lieu of TaxesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:00 P.M.