Carroll County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0156 / CH0524Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fee IncreasesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 524Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0158
    (SB0037)
Carroll County - GamingIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0181
    (SB0040 / CH0008)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0182
    (SB0557 / CH0064)
Carroll County - Sheriff - SalaryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0183
    (SB0558 / CH0303)
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development AuthorityIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0210
    (SB0561)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0211
    (SB0556 / CH0179)
Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0360Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages License Fees - Underage DrinkingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0369
    (SB0559)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building RenovationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0545
    (SB0555 / CH0063)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.