Carroll County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0169
    (SB0219 / CH0180)
Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0176
    (SB0298)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building RenovationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0194
    (SB0195 / CH0053)
Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of PersonnelVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0205 / CH0254
    (SB0296)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0737 / CH0275
    (SB0677)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Beginning Hour of SaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 275Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0791 / CH0120
    (SB0746)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0894
    (SB0952)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire DepartmentIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1147 / CH0301Carroll County - Board of Education Members - Term Limitation and ReferendumApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1525Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Carroll County - Warrant Intercept ProgramIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1640
    (SB1167)
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims ActIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesBy Request - CommitteeCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.