Carroll County Delegation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0218 / CH0433
    (SB0107)
Carroll County - Huckster, Hawker, or Peddler License - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Environment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0219 / CH0046Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Judiciary
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0249
    (SB0324 / CH0434)
Carroll County - Mechanical Musical Devices - Licensing Requirements - RepealVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0251 / CH0435
    (SB0323)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0479
    (SB0606)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Union Mills Homestead RestorationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0545Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - BingoIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0565 / CH0121
    (SB0372 / CH0122)
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph TestingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB0573
    (SB0456 / CH0437)
Carroll County - State's Attorney - SalaryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0574
    (SB0457 / CH0436)
Carroll County - Sheriff's SalaryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1005
    (SB0840)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of WestminsterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.