Carroll County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 11)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0609 / CH0089
    (SB0360)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0610 / CH0266
    (SB0275 / CH0267)
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday ProhibitionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0612
    (SB0272)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Carroll County Veterans Independence ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0621 / CH0265
    (SB0359 / CH0264)
Carroll County - Board of Education - Student RepresentativeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 265Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0632 / CH0262
    (SB0276 / CH0263)
Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0641
    (SB0274)
Carroll County - Coin Operated Games - Repeal of Licensing RequirementsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0696 / CH0271
    (SB0601 / CH0270)
Carroll County - Scenic River Advisory Board - CompositionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 271Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0884
    (SB0273)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Gamber and Community Fire Company Carnival GroundsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0984 / CH0268
    (SB0542 / CH0269)
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical ServicesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1000
    (SB0437)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of WestminsterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1116 / CH0493
    (SB1152)
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit ExemptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:25 P.M.