Carroll County Senators

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0428 / CH0466
    (HB0319 / CH0467)
Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student RepresentativeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 466Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0429 / CH0468
    (HB0305 / CH0469)
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0430
    (HB0310)
Carroll County - GamingIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
SB0588 / CH0063
    (HB0846)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0637Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0848Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License FeesIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.