Carroll County Senators

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0296
    (HB0205 / CH0254)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0298
    (HB0176)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building RenovationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0677
    (HB0737 / CH0275)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Beginning Hour of SaleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0952
    (HB0894)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire DepartmentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.