Carroll County Senators

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0107
    (HB0218 / CH0433)
Carroll County - Huckster, Hawker, or Peddler License - RepealVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0323
    (HB0251 / CH0435)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0324 / CH0434
    (HB0249)
Carroll County - Mechanical Musical Devices - Licensing Requirements - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 434Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0372 / CH0122
    (HB0565 / CH0121)
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph TestingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
SB0456 / CH0437
    (HB0573)
Carroll County - State's Attorney - SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0457 / CH0436
    (HB0574)
Carroll County - Sheriff's SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 436Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0606
    (HB0479)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Union Mills Homestead RestorationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0840
    (HB1005)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of WestminsterIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.