Cecil County Senators

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0714
    (HB0767)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor PoolIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0715
    (HB0832 / CH0125)
Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - ApplicationsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeFamily Law (D4)
SB0716 / CH0575
    (HB0246 / CH0576)
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 575Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
SB0733
    (HB0761)
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
SB0958 / CH0454
    (HB1071 / CH0455)
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.