Charles County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0530Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the ArtsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0536Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Recreation CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0550 / CH0819Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1723 / CH0625Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate EarningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1737
    (SB1266)
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License FeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic MattersBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:00 P.M.