Commerce, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 7)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0089Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - ExtensionIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0092
    (SB0498 / CH0453)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0094 / CH0258Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0161Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RestructuringIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0245 / CH0259Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and RestructuringApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0872Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development ProjectsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0498 / CH0453
    (HB0092)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 11:03 A.M.