Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 12)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0105 / CH0083Maryland Health Care Commission - Powers - Authority to Award Funds and Make Agreements With Grantees and PayeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 83Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB0106 / CH0084Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset ExtensionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0459 / CH0099Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician AssistantsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
HB0590 / CH0413Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB0668 / CH0417Income Tax Credit - Health Enterprise Zones - ModificationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB1510 / CH0460Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and DutiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB1511Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0102 / CH0029Health - Use of Alternate Care Sites During a State of Emergency - AuthorizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 29Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0103 / CH0030Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and ModernizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0104 / CH0275Health Officers and Baltimore City Commissioner of Health - Authority to Retain Collections and Waive ChargesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 275Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0105 / CH0031Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Finance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.