Human Resources, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0245 / CH0090Family Law - Substance-Exposed NewbornsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0071Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement PlansIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0086 / CH0022Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of AssistanceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0178Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of PaternityIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)
SB0181Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support ObligationIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsBy Request - DepartmentalFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.