Labor, Licensing and Regulation, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 20)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0347 / CH0613Professional Engineers - Firm PermitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0348 / CH0098Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Application for Refund or AdjustmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0349 / CH0099Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0351 / CH0101State Athletic Commission - Amateur Mixed Martial Arts and Amateur Kick Boxing - Licensing and RegulationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0352State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Civil Penalties - Citation AuthorityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0353 / CH0102Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Licensing - ExaminationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0354 / CH0103Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Monetary Penalty for FraudApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0355 / CH0104State Board of Stationary Engineers - Qualifications for Stationary Engineer's Examination - Grade 1 and Grade 2Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0583 / CH0121Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - RestrictionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB1368Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - RevisionsIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0057State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Prohibited Acts - Civil PenaltyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0058 / CH0439Adult Education and Literacy Services - High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0066 / CH0440Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Membership, Quorum, Meetings, and ReportsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 440Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0077State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas FittersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0078Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - ClaimsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0081 / CH0020Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 20Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0082 / CH0441Elevator Safety - Third-Party Inspectors - CertificationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
SB0084State Board of Examiners of Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency RequirementsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0179Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm PermitsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0280 / CH0454Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency RequirementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.