Labor, Licensing and Regulation, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 12)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0187
    (SB0006)
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – ExpansionIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0188 / CH0045
    (SB0077 / CH0046)
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0193
    (SB0043)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0194 / CH0049State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - ExemptionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0200 / CH0160
    (SB0064 / CH0159)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 160Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0201 / CH0047
    (SB0106 / CH0048)
State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-TrainingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0848Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting AgenciesIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0006
    (HB0187)
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - ExpansionIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0043
    (HB0193)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0064 / CH0159
    (HB0200 / CH0160)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0077 / CH0046
    (HB0188 / CH0045)
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0106 / CH0048
    (HB0201 / CH0047)
State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-TrainingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 24, 2018 2:55 P.M.