Transportation, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 9)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0420 / CH0113Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of TollsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0430 / CH0371Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor VehiclesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0064 / CH0015Controlled Hazardous Substance Vehicles - Display of CertificatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 15Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
SB0072 / CH0176Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0073 / CH0018Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening StandardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0075 / CH0019Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of CitationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 19Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0076Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous FeesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationBy Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0085 / CH0021Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port FacilitiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0087 / CH0179Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 179Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.