Workers' Compensation Commission

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 2 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1330 / CH0676Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer ComplianceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0065 / CH0016Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of DecisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 16Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalWorkers' Compensation (K1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.