Legislative Services, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0206
    (SB0237 / CH0211)
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0209
    (SB0238 / CH0212)
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/7/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0210
    (SB0236)
State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/7/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1348 / CH0680Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Revisions and ClarificationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 680Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0236
    (HB0210)
State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0237 / CH0211
    (HB0206)
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0238 / CH0212
    (HB0209)
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 212Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0283 / CH0042Annual Curative BillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0284 / CH0043Annual Corrective BillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0305 / CH0224
    (HB0296)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - OtherPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.