Dorchester County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0066 / CH0433
    (SB0002 / CH0432)
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - SundaysApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0068 / CH0445
    (SB0149 / CH0444)
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-BreweriesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 445Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0069 / CH0007
    (SB0006 / CH0006)
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0133 / CH0447
    (SB0150 / CH0446)
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.