Dorchester County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0167 / CH0123
    (SB0060 / CH0122)
Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday SalesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 123Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0180 / CH0126
    (SB0076 / CH0125)
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale AuthorizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Generally (L1)
HB0285
    (SB0152 / CH0040)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal RedevelopmentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0390
    (SB0057 / CH0121)
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.