Economic Development and Business Climate Commission, MD

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 14)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1250
    (SB0841)
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - ExemptionIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1251
    (SB0844)
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1252
    (SB0842)
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor ApportionmentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1253
    (SB0840)
Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - RefundabilityIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1254
    (SB0845)
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation HolidayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1255
    (SB0843 / CH0582)
Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset ProvisionsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0840
    (HB1253)
Income Tax - Rates, Personal Exemptions, and Earned Income Tax CreditIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedBudget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0841
    (HB1250)
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - ExemptionIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0842
    (HB1252)
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor ApportionmentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0843 / CH0582
    (HB1255)
Tax Credits - EvaluationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 582Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0844
    (HB1251)
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0845
    (HB1254)
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation HolidayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0846Corporate Income Tax - Rate ReductionIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0847Estate Tax - Exclusion AmountIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.