Economic Matters Committee, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 16)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0347 / CH0613Professional Engineers - Firm PermitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0348 / CH0098Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Application for Refund or AdjustmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0349 / CH0099Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0350 / CH0100Business Regulation - Outdoor Musical Festival Promoter License - Repeal of Safety Permit RequirementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 100Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0351 / CH0101State Athletic Commission - Amateur Mixed Martial Arts and Amateur Kick Boxing - Licensing and RegulationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0352State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Civil Penalties - Citation AuthorityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0353 / CH0102Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Licensing - ExaminationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0354 / CH0103Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Monetary Penalty for FraudApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0355 / CH0104State Board of Stationary Engineers - Qualifications for Stationary Engineer's Examination - Grade 1 and Grade 2Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0356 / CH0105Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0392 / CH0111Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium IncreaseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0431 / CH0115Insurance - Maryland Insurance Acquisitions Disclosure and Control Act - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0583 / CH0121Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - RestrictionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB1330 / CH0676Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer ComplianceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB1368Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - RevisionsIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0296
    (SB0305 / CH0224)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.