Economic Matters Committee, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0005State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas FittersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0006 / CH0211Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - ClaimsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0467 / CH0100Labor and Employment - Employment of MinorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 100Economic Matters
2/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0468Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund - Training and Technology ProjectsIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1417 / CH0251Unemployment Insurance - Work SharingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Economic Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.