Economic Matters Committee, Chair

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1226 / CH0120Apprenticeship and Training - Replacement of Obsolete ReferencesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1227 / CH0121Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Examination Waiver RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1244 / CH0123Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Name ChangeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 123Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
HB0312
    (SB0077 / CH0008)
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing StatementsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCommercial Law - Generally (I4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.